E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5974
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3098
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3098
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3013
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5866
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2187
|
Journal Page: 5865
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5865
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2985
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5090
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5090
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2350
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2349
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2349
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2349
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2347
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1176
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3247
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3247
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 459
|
Journal Page: 3247
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2792
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 884
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 875
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 875
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 875
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 875
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 875
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 874
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 874
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 874
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 874
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Postponed
|
4/11/23 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 880
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 706
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 579
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 156
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|