Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1404 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2023

                    S.B. No. 1404


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a work group to study the benefits of
 coal-to-nuclear electric generating facility conversion.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITION. In this Act, "work group" means the
 coal-to-nuclear conversion work group established under Section 2
 of this Act.
 SECTION 2.  WORK GROUP FORMATION AND ADMINISTRATION. (a)
 The coal-to-nuclear conversion work group is established and
 composed of 16 members with:
 (1)  one member of the senate appointed by the
 lieutenant governor;
 (2)  one member of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives;
 (3)  two members representing institutions of higher
 education appointed by the governor;
 (4)  one ex officio member representing the Public
 Utility Commission of Texas appointed by the governor;
 (5)  one ex officio member representing the independent
 organization certified under Section 39.151, Utilities Code, for
 the ERCOT power region appointed by the governor; and
 (6)  10 members of the public who have knowledge and
 experience in nuclear engineering, nuclear safety, energy policy,
 or economic analysis, and who are appointed as follows:
 (A)  five members appointed by the speaker of the
 house of representatives; and
 (B)  five members appointed by the lieutenant
 governor.
 (b)  The work group members described by Subsections (a)(1)
 and (2) of this section serve as co-chairs of the work group.
 (c)  The work group shall meet at the call of its co-chairs.
 (d)  The work group may form committees for the efficient
 operation of the work group, at the discretion of the co-chairs of
 the work group. The co-chairs of the work group shall appoint the
 presiding officer of each committee. The presiding officer of a
 committee may invite other members of the work group to serve on the
 committee. A committee may consult with subject matter experts.
 (e)  The work group may adopt rules, procedures, and policies
 as necessary or convenient to administer this Act and fulfill the
 responsibilities of the work group.
 (f)  A member of the work group may not receive compensation
 for serving on the work group but is entitled to reimbursement for
 expenses incurred by the member in the performance of official
 duties as a member of the work group as provided by the General
 Appropriations Act.
 (g)  The senate and the house of representatives shall
 provide administrative support to the work group as necessary to
 implement this Act.
 SECTION 3.  WORK GROUP DUTIES. (a)  The work group shall:
 (1)  study the benefits of converting sites in this
 state with coal-fired electric generating facilities to use nuclear
 electric generating facilities instead; and
 (2)  develop a model plan for implementing
 coal-to-nuclear conversion to provide affordable and sustainable
 power in this state.
 (b)  In developing the model plan, the work group shall:
 (1)  conduct a comprehensive review of research and
 information on coal-to-nuclear conversion and related issues;
 (2)  engage in stakeholder outreach to gather feedback
 and input from the public, industry, state agencies, and relevant
 organizations;
 (3)  identify the potential benefits of
 coal-to-nuclear conversion, including cost-effectiveness, energy
 security, and reduced environmental impact;
 (4)  assess the economic viability of coal-to-nuclear
 conversion and provide recommendations on financing and
 cost-effectiveness; and
 (5)  consider the regulatory framework and
 requirements for coal-to-nuclear conversion and provide
 recommendations for streamlining the conversion process.
 (c)  Not later than October 31, 2024, the work group shall
 submit to each standing committee of the senate and house of
 representatives with oversight jurisdiction over environmental
 concerns or electric utilities a report that includes the model
 plan developed under this section and any findings or
 recommendations made by a committee formed under Section 2(d) of
 this Act.
 SECTION 4.  APPOINTMENTS.  As soon as practicable, but not
 later than October 1, 2023, the governor, lieutenant governor, and
 speaker of the house of representatives shall appoint the members
 of the work group.
 SECTION 5.  INITIAL MEETING.  Not later than November 1,
 2023, the work group shall hold its initial meeting at the call of
 the co-chairs of the work group.
 SECTION 6.  EXPIRATION. This Act expires and the work group
 is abolished June 30, 2025.
 SECTION 7.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect September
 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1404 passed the Senate on
 April 25, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1404 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 134,
 Nays 4, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor