1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 1404 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the creation of a work group to study the benefits of |
---|
6 | 6 | | coal-to-nuclear electric generating facility conversion. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. DEFINITION. In this Act, "work group" means the |
---|
9 | 9 | | coal-to-nuclear conversion work group established under Section 2 |
---|
10 | 10 | | of this Act. |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 2. WORK GROUP FORMATION AND ADMINISTRATION. (a) |
---|
12 | 12 | | The coal-to-nuclear conversion work group is established and |
---|
13 | 13 | | composed of 16 members with: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) one member of the senate appointed by the |
---|
15 | 15 | | lieutenant governor; |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) one member of the house of representatives |
---|
17 | 17 | | appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (3) two members representing institutions of higher |
---|
19 | 19 | | education appointed by the governor; |
---|
20 | 20 | | (4) one ex officio member representing the Public |
---|
21 | 21 | | Utility Commission of Texas appointed by the governor; |
---|
22 | 22 | | (5) one ex officio member representing the independent |
---|
23 | 23 | | organization certified under Section 39.151, Utilities Code, for |
---|
24 | 24 | | the ERCOT power region appointed by the governor; and |
---|
25 | 25 | | (6) 10 members of the public who have knowledge and |
---|
26 | 26 | | experience in nuclear engineering, nuclear safety, energy policy, |
---|
27 | 27 | | or economic analysis, and who are appointed as follows: |
---|
28 | 28 | | (A) five members appointed by the speaker of the |
---|
29 | 29 | | house of representatives; and |
---|
30 | 30 | | (B) five members appointed by the lieutenant |
---|
31 | 31 | | governor. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (b) The work group members described by Subsections (a)(1) |
---|
33 | 33 | | and (2) of this section serve as co-chairs of the work group. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (c) The work group shall meet at the call of its co-chairs. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (d) The work group may form committees for the efficient |
---|
36 | 36 | | operation of the work group, at the discretion of the co-chairs of |
---|
37 | 37 | | the work group. The co-chairs of the work group shall appoint the |
---|
38 | 38 | | presiding officer of each committee. The presiding officer of a |
---|
39 | 39 | | committee may invite other members of the work group to serve on the |
---|
40 | 40 | | committee. A committee may consult with subject matter experts. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (e) The work group may adopt rules, procedures, and policies |
---|
42 | 42 | | as necessary or convenient to administer this Act and fulfill the |
---|
43 | 43 | | responsibilities of the work group. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (f) A member of the work group may not receive compensation |
---|
45 | 45 | | for serving on the work group but is entitled to reimbursement for |
---|
46 | 46 | | expenses incurred by the member in the performance of official |
---|
47 | 47 | | duties as a member of the work group as provided by the General |
---|
48 | 48 | | Appropriations Act. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (g) The senate and the house of representatives shall |
---|
50 | 50 | | provide administrative support to the work group as necessary to |
---|
51 | 51 | | implement this Act. |
---|
52 | 52 | | SECTION 3. WORK GROUP DUTIES. (a) The work group shall: |
---|
53 | 53 | | (1) study the benefits of converting sites in this |
---|
54 | 54 | | state with coal-fired electric generating facilities to use nuclear |
---|
55 | 55 | | electric generating facilities instead; and |
---|
56 | 56 | | (2) develop a model plan for implementing |
---|
57 | 57 | | coal-to-nuclear conversion to provide affordable and sustainable |
---|
58 | 58 | | power in this state. |
---|
59 | 59 | | (b) In developing the model plan, the work group shall: |
---|
60 | 60 | | (1) conduct a comprehensive review of research and |
---|
61 | 61 | | information on coal-to-nuclear conversion and related issues; |
---|
62 | 62 | | (2) engage in stakeholder outreach to gather feedback |
---|
63 | 63 | | and input from the public, industry, state agencies, and relevant |
---|
64 | 64 | | organizations; |
---|
65 | 65 | | (3) identify the potential benefits of |
---|
66 | 66 | | coal-to-nuclear conversion, including cost-effectiveness, energy |
---|
67 | 67 | | security, and reduced environmental impact; |
---|
68 | 68 | | (4) assess the economic viability of coal-to-nuclear |
---|
69 | 69 | | conversion and provide recommendations on financing and |
---|
70 | 70 | | cost-effectiveness; and |
---|
71 | 71 | | (5) consider the regulatory framework and |
---|
72 | 72 | | requirements for coal-to-nuclear conversion and provide |
---|
73 | 73 | | recommendations for streamlining the conversion process. |
---|
74 | 74 | | (c) Not later than October 31, 2024, the work group shall |
---|
75 | 75 | | submit to each standing committee of the senate and house of |
---|
76 | 76 | | representatives with oversight jurisdiction over environmental |
---|
77 | 77 | | concerns or electric utilities a report that includes the model |
---|
78 | 78 | | plan developed under this section and any findings or |
---|
79 | 79 | | recommendations made by a committee formed under Section 2(d) of |
---|
80 | 80 | | this Act. |
---|
81 | 81 | | SECTION 4. APPOINTMENTS. As soon as practicable, but not |
---|
82 | 82 | | later than October 1, 2023, the governor, lieutenant governor, and |
---|
83 | 83 | | speaker of the house of representatives shall appoint the members |
---|
84 | 84 | | of the work group. |
---|
85 | 85 | | SECTION 5. INITIAL MEETING. Not later than November 1, |
---|
86 | 86 | | 2023, the work group shall hold its initial meeting at the call of |
---|
87 | 87 | | the co-chairs of the work group. |
---|
88 | 88 | | SECTION 6. EXPIRATION. This Act expires and the work group |
---|
89 | 89 | | is abolished June 30, 2025. |
---|
90 | 90 | | SECTION 7. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect September |
---|
91 | 91 | | 1, 2023. |
---|
92 | 92 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
93 | 93 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
94 | 94 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1404 passed the Senate on |
---|
95 | 95 | | April 25, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1; and that |
---|
96 | 96 | | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2023, by the |
---|
97 | 97 | | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
98 | 98 | | ______________________________ |
---|
99 | 99 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
100 | 100 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1404 passed the House, with |
---|
101 | 101 | | amendment, on May 24, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 134, |
---|
102 | 102 | | Nays 4, one present not voting. |
---|
103 | 103 | | ______________________________ |
---|
104 | 104 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
105 | 105 | | Approved: |
---|
106 | 106 | | ______________________________ |
---|
107 | 107 | | Date |
---|
108 | 108 | | ______________________________ |
---|
109 | 109 | | Governor |
---|