Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1404 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 7, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis July 10, 2023
Bill May 28, 2023
Bill May 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis July 10, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note May 13, 2023
Fiscal Note April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note April 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023