House | 04/18/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 866 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 881 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 769 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1629 | |
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Border Security | Journal Page: 375 | |
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |