E | 06/02/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 06/02/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3308 | |
E | 05/19/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4827 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2130 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2138 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4573 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Record vote | RV#1816 | Journal Page: 4572 |
House | 05/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4572 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4572 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4421 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Record vote | RV#1781 | Journal Page: 4420 |
House | 05/17/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4420 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 4420 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Postponed | 5/17/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 4382 |
House | 05/16/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4382 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3211 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2337 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1401 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1364 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1364 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1364 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1364 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1364 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1364 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1364 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2463 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 444 | |
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |