E | 05/24/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/24/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2684 | |
E | 05/12/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1859 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4216 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1833 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3875 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1493 | Journal Page: 3874 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3874 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3874 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3829 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1470 | Journal Page: 3829 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3829 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3829 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3184 | Journal Page: 3829 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 890 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 890 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 890 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 890 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 890 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 890 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 890 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 769 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1495 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 445 | |
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |