Senate | 05/17/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2060 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1750 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Border Security | Journal Page: 447 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 447 | |
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |