Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1481 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/10/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Creighton S.B. No. 1481
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Border Security;
 May 10, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 3,
 Nays 2; May 10, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE VOTE              YeaNayAbsent PNVBirdwell       X              Flores         X              Blanco            X           Hinojosa          X           King           X


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exercise of eminent domain authority by the Texas
 Facilities Commission to build a wall along this state's
 international border.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter L, Chapter 2166, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2166.555 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2166.555.  INTERNATIONAL BORDER WALL. (a)  The
 commission may exercise the power of eminent domain under Section
 2166.055 to acquire an interest in real property for the
 construction, extension, improvement, or development of a wall
 along this state's international border for the purposes of
 preventing:
 (1)  human trafficking; and
 (2)  illegal entry into the United States of:
 (A)  aliens without official approval of an
 appropriate federal governmental authority;
 (B)  terrorists and instruments of terrorism; and
 (C)  contraband, including narcotics and other
 controlled substances.
 (b)  The commission may exercise the power of eminent domain
 under Subsection (a) to acquire:
 (1)  land in fee simple; or
 (2)  any interest less than fee simple in, on, under, or
 above land, including an easement, right-of-way, or right of use of
 airspace or subsurface space.
 (c)  The commission must adopt a resolution in accordance
 with Section 2206.053 before filing a condemnation petition under
 Chapter 21, Property Code, to exercise the power of eminent domain
 under this section.
 (d)  The resolution required by Subsection (c):
 (1)  must include a statement that the commission's
 acquisition of the property interest described in the resolution:
 (A)  is a public necessity; and
 (B)  is necessary and proper for the construction,
 extension, improvement, or development of a wall along this state's
 international border and is in the public interest; and
 (2)  is conclusive evidence of the public necessity of
 the proposed acquisition and that the property interest is
 necessary for public use.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *