Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1516 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 15, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 11, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 19, 2023
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis July 12, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis April 15, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023

Conference Committee Report*

Bill
Fiscal Note