E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5617
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2810
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2810
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2810
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2405
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1939
|
Journal Page: 4876
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4876
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4875
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4875
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4793
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Moody
|
Journal Page: 4793
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4793
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Postponed
|
5/19/23 3:00PM
|
Journal Page: 4676
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4676
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1633
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 884
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Border Security
|
|
Journal Page: 450
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|