House | 05/06/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3344 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3344 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3068 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1543 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3344 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 450 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |