Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1534 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/05/2023 8:30 am
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/18/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 18 2023 12:44PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Failed to pass
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 27 2023 6:39PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Received from the Senate
Introduced
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/18/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar