House | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 4384 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4384 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4316 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1929 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1882 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1882 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1882 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1882 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1881 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1881 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1923 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1750 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Considered by subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Considered by subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4384 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres | Journal Page: 452 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |