Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1537 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 18, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill May 15, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 19, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 18, 2023