Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1568 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/24/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Introduced
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 24 2023 4:04PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 24 2023 4:04PM
05/08/2023 8:30 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
03/30/2023 8:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor