E
|
05/13/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/13/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
E
|
05/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1491
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2788
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1455
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1433
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1203
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1824
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#416
|
Journal Page: 1824
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1824
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1824
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1766
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#377
|
Journal Page: 1766
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1766
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1766
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 797
|
Journal Page: 1766
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 981
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 981
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 846
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 543
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 476
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 981
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 159
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|