E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/23/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4980
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4983
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2327
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2271
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2271
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2271
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2071
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4582
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1827
|
Journal Page: 4582
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4582
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4582
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4472
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1798
|
Journal Page: 4472
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4472
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4471
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4317
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1633
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2271
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4582
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4471
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 993
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 993
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 992
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Creighton
|
Journal Page: 992
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 992
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 992
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Miles
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 991
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1004
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 458
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|