Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1599 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 29, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 12, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 6, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 6, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023