House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1299 | |
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1299 | |
House | 03/30/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 685 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 678 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 678 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 678 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 678 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 683 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 678 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 678 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 635 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 616 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 582 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1299 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 159 | |
Senate | 11/14/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |