Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB162 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 14, 2023
Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill March 29, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 22, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill March 22, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 14, 2023