Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1636 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/06/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            88R7631 MP-D
 By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1636


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of wildland-urban interface areas and
 the adoption and enforcement of the wildland-urban interface code;
 providing a civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Section 12.052 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.052.  WILDLAND-URBAN INTERFACE CODE AND AREAS. (a)
 In this section, "wildland-urban interface area" means the
 geographic area where structures and other human development meets
 or intermingles with wildland or vegetative fuels.
 (b)  The department by rule shall:
 (1)  adopt the Wildland-Urban Interface Code as it
 existed on January 1, 2023, as the wildland-urban interface code
 for this state; and
 (2)  designate the wildland-urban interface areas of
 this state for which a municipality or county must under other law
 enforce the wildland-urban interface code.
 (c)  In designating the wildland-urban interface areas of
 this state under Subsection (b)(2), the department:
 (1)  shall consult:
 (A)  the Parks and Wildlife Department; and
 (B)  the Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service; and
 (2)  may consult any other relevant state or federal
 agency, political subdivision, or nongovernmental organization.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter G, Chapter 214, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 214.2165 to read as follows:
 Sec. 214.2165.  WILDLAND-URBAN INTERFACE CODE. (a) Each
 municipality shall establish procedures for the administration and
 enforcement of the wildland-urban interface code adopted under
 Section 12.052, Agriculture Code, in a wildland-urban interface
 area designated under that section that is located in the
 municipality.
 (b)  To the extent of a conflict between the wildland-urban
 interface code enforced under this section and an applicable fire
 or building code, the more stringent provision prevails.
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Subchapter C, Chapter 233, Local
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER C. FIRE AND WILDLAND-URBAN INTERFACE CODES [CODE IN
 UNINCORPORATED AREA]
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter C, Chapter 233, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 233.0611 to read as follows:
 Sec. 233.0611.  ENFORCEMENT OF WILDLAND-URBAN INTERFACE
 CODE.  (a) The commissioners court of each county shall adopt rules
 necessary to administer and enforce the wildland-urban interface
 code adopted under Section 12.052, Agriculture Code.
 (b)  A wildland-urban interface code enforced under this
 section applies only in the wildland-urban interface area
 designated under Section 12.052, Agriculture Code, that is located
 in the unincorporated area of the county.
 (c)  To the extent of any conflict between the wildland-urban
 interface code enforced under this section and an applicable fire
 or building code, the more stringent provision prevails.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 233.063(a) and (c), Local Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person may not construct or substantially improve a
 building subject to a code adopted or enforced under this
 subchapter [described by Section 233.062(a)] in an unincorporated
 area of the county unless the person obtains a building permit
 issued in accordance with this subchapter.
 (c)  Within 30 days after the date the commissioners court
 receives an application and fee in accordance with Subsection (b),
 the commissioners court shall:
 (1)  issue the permit if the plan complies with the
 applicable codes adopted or enforced under this subchapter [fire
 code]; or
 (2)  deny the permit if the plan does not comply with
 the applicable codes adopted or enforced under this subchapter
 [fire code].
 SECTION 6.  Sections 233.064(a), (d), (f), (g), and (h),
 Local Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The county shall inspect a building subject to this
 subchapter to determine whether the building complies with the
 applicable codes adopted or enforced under this subchapter [fire
 code].
 (d)  On or before the date that construction or substantial
 improvement of a building subject to this subchapter is completed,
 the owner of the building shall request in writing that the county
 inspect the building for compliance with the applicable codes [fire
 code].
 (f)  The county shall issue a final certificate of compliance
 to the owner of a building inspected under this section if the
 inspector determines, after an inspection of the completed
 building, that the building complies with the applicable codes
 [fire code]. For a building or complex of buildings involving
 phased completion or build-out, the county may issue a partial
 certificate of compliance for any portion of the building or
 complex the inspector determines is in substantial compliance with
 the applicable codes [fire code].
 (g)  If the inspector determines, after an inspection of the
 completed building, that the building does not comply with the
 applicable codes [fire code], the county may:
 (1)  deny the certificate of compliance; or
 (2)  issue a conditional or partial certificate of
 compliance and allow the building to be occupied.
 (h)  A county that issues a conditional certificate of
 compliance under Subsection (g) shall notify the owner of the
 building of the violations of the applicable codes [fire code] and
 establish a reasonable time to remedy the violations. A county may
 revoke a conditional certificate of compliance if the owner does
 not remedy the violations within the time specified on the
 conditional certificate of compliance.
 SECTION 7.  Sections 233.065(c) and (d), Local Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The county shall deposit fees received under this
 subchapter in a special fund in the county treasury, and money in
 that fund may be used only for the administration and enforcement of
 a [the fire] code adopted or enforced under this subchapter.
 (d)  The fee for an [a fire code] inspection under this
 subchapter must be reasonable and reflect the approximate cost of
 the inspection personnel, materials, and administrative overhead.
 SECTION 8.  Section 233.066, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 233.066.  INJUNCTION. The appropriate attorney
 representing the county in the district court may seek injunctive
 relief to prevent the violation or threatened violation of a [the
 fire] code adopted or enforced under this subchapter.
 SECTION 9.  Section 233.067(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The appropriate attorney representing the county in
 civil cases may file a civil action in a court of competent
 jurisdiction to recover from a person who violates a [the fire] code
 adopted or enforced under this subchapter a civil penalty in an
 amount not to exceed $200 for each day on which the violation
 exists. In determining the amount of the penalty, the court shall
 consider the seriousness of the violation.
 SECTION 10.  (a)  Not later than November 1, 2023, the
 Department of Agriculture by rule shall adopt a wildland-urban
 interface code and designate the wildland-urban interface areas of
 this state, as required by Section 12.052, Agriculture Code, as
 added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2023, the governing body of
 each municipality and county shall adopt procedures or rules
 necessary to administer and enforce the wildland-urban interface
 code, as required by Sections 214.2165 and 233.0611, Local
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 11.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.