1 | 1 | | 88R7854 SRA-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Birdwell S.B. No. 1688 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to requirements for a qualified business participating in |
---|
8 | 8 | | the enterprise zone program during a certain period. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 2303, Government Code, is |
---|
11 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 2303.499 to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 2303.499. CERTAIN REQUIREMENTS WAIVED DURING COVID |
---|
13 | 13 | | RELIEF PERIOD. (a) In this section, "COVID relief period" means |
---|
14 | 14 | | the period beginning March 1, 2020, and ending December 31, 2021. |
---|
15 | 15 | | (b) Notwithstanding Section 2303.003(7)(C) or any other |
---|
16 | 16 | | law, the requirement that an employee perform at least 50 percent of |
---|
17 | 17 | | the person's service for the business at the qualified business |
---|
18 | 18 | | site to be a "qualified employee" is waived for an annual |
---|
19 | 19 | | certification or job retention period that includes the COVID |
---|
20 | 20 | | relief period. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (c) A qualified business in compliance with this chapter |
---|
22 | 22 | | before the COVID relief period that is eligible for a waiver under |
---|
23 | 23 | | Subsection (b) may elect to withdraw its project or activity from |
---|
24 | 24 | | designation as an enterprise project by December 31, 2023. A |
---|
25 | 25 | | qualified business that withdraws its enterprise project |
---|
26 | 26 | | designation under this subsection is considered eligible for any |
---|
27 | 27 | | refund of state taxes under Section 2303.504 approved for the COVID |
---|
28 | 28 | | relief period, notwithstanding the requirements for meeting the |
---|
29 | 29 | | definition of a new permanent job under Section 2303.401(1)(C) or a |
---|
30 | 30 | | retained job under Section 2303.401(2)(C). |
---|
31 | 31 | | (d) This section expires December 31, 2030. |
---|
32 | 32 | | SECTION 2. Section 151.429, Tax Code, is amended by adding |
---|
33 | 33 | | Subsection (g-1) to read as follows: |
---|
34 | 34 | | (g-1) The comptroller shall waive the requirements of |
---|
35 | 35 | | Subsection (g) for a qualified business that did not meet the |
---|
36 | 36 | | requirement that a qualified employee perform at least 50 percent |
---|
37 | 37 | | of the person's service for the business at the qualified business |
---|
38 | 38 | | site, as defined by Section 2303.003, at any time during the period |
---|
39 | 39 | | beginning March 1, 2020, and ending December 31, 2021. This |
---|
40 | 40 | | subsection expires December 31, 2030. |
---|
41 | 41 | | SECTION 3. Section 2303.499, Government Code, and Section |
---|
42 | 42 | | 151.429(g-1), Tax Code, as added by this Act, apply to any audit by |
---|
43 | 43 | | the comptroller of whether an enterprise project is eligible for a |
---|
44 | 44 | | tax refund under Section 151.429, Tax Code, that is not finally |
---|
45 | 45 | | completed before the effective date of this Act. |
---|
46 | 46 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
47 | 47 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
48 | 48 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
49 | 49 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
50 | 50 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|