Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1688 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/06/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            88R7854 SRA-F
 By: Birdwell S.B. No. 1688


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requirements for a qualified business participating in
 the enterprise zone program during a certain period.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 2303, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2303.499 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2303.499.  CERTAIN REQUIREMENTS WAIVED DURING COVID
 RELIEF PERIOD. (a)  In this section, "COVID relief period" means
 the period beginning March 1, 2020, and ending December 31, 2021.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 2303.003(7)(C) or any other
 law, the requirement that an employee perform at least 50 percent of
 the person's service for the business at the qualified business
 site to be a "qualified employee" is waived for an annual
 certification or job retention period that includes the COVID
 relief period.
 (c)  A qualified business in compliance with this chapter
 before the COVID relief period that is eligible for a waiver under
 Subsection (b) may elect to withdraw its project or activity from
 designation as an enterprise project by December 31, 2023. A
 qualified business that withdraws its enterprise project
 designation under this subsection is considered eligible for any
 refund of state taxes under Section 2303.504 approved for the COVID
 relief period, notwithstanding the requirements for meeting the
 definition of a new permanent job under Section 2303.401(1)(C) or a
 retained job under Section 2303.401(2)(C).
 (d)  This section expires December 31, 2030.
 SECTION 2.  Section 151.429, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (g-1) to read as follows:
 (g-1)  The comptroller shall waive the requirements of
 Subsection (g) for a qualified business that did not meet the
 requirement that a qualified employee perform at least 50 percent
 of the person's service for the business at the qualified business
 site, as defined by Section 2303.003, at any time during the period
 beginning March 1, 2020, and ending December 31, 2021. This
 subsection expires December 31, 2030.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2303.499, Government Code, and Section
 151.429(g-1), Tax Code, as added by this Act, apply to any audit by
 the comptroller of whether an enterprise project is eligible for a
 tax refund under Section 151.429, Tax Code, that is not finally
 completed before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.