E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6425
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6066
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6066
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3154
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3001
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3001
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5626
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5626
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2938
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2938
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2938
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2938
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2013
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4401
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1759
|
Journal Page: 4400
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4400
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4400
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4364
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Craddick
|
Journal Page: 4364
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4364
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3859
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 930
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 896
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 896
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 896
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 896
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 896
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 896
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 896
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 706
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1495
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 470
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|