E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/25/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5615
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2405
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4861
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1922
|
Journal Page: 4860
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4860
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4860
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4666
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4666
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1468
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 471
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|