E
|
06/02/2023
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
March 1, 2024
|
|
E
|
06/02/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
E
|
05/19/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2013
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4418
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1780
|
Journal Page: 4418
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4418
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4418
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4381
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1752
|
Journal Page: 4381
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4381
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4381
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3713
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2192
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1360
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1323
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1323
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1323
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Menndez
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1238
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|