Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1794 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 17, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 8, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 15, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 15, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2023