E
|
06/17/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3279
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3099
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3098
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3098
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3098
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5619
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5619
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5619
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2965
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2964
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2964
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2964
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2961
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5023
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1978
|
Journal Page: 5023
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5023
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5009
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote RV#1978
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4926
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1956
|
Journal Page: 4926
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4926
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(5)
|
Journal Page: 4921
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote RV#1956
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
11-Raymond
|
Journal Page: 4919
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(5)
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote RV#1955
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 11-Raymond
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote RV#1954
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 10-Reynolds
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote RV#1953
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 9-J. Jones
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote RV#1952
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 8-V. Jones
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote RV#1951
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 7-Neave Criado
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 6-Perez
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote RV#1950
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-J. Jones
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote RV#1949
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 11, Section 2, and Rule 11, Section 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended
|
2-Cole
|
Journal Page: 4905
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Tinderholt
|
Journal Page: 4905
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 4905
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Tinderholt
|
Journal Page: 4904
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4901
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Postponed
|
After SB 2627
|
Journal Page: 4891
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4891
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4588
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 4588
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Point of order sustained Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4587
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1838
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3098
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5023
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4891
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1191
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1191
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Blanco
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Blanco
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 956
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered by subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered by subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred to s/c on Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 374
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|