Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1817 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 14, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note April 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023