E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/25/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5615
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2350
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4328
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1718
|
Journal Page: 4327
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4327
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4327
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4252
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4252
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1691
|
Journal Page: 4251
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Rose
|
Journal Page: 4248
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4248
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4049
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 638
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 233
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 161
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|