Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1864 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 17, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Witness List

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023