Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1910 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 21, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 30, 2023
Witness List

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note March 22, 2023