House | 05/04/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1925 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1925 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1469 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 960 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 850 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 805 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1925 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 501 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |