Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1911 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 24, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 5, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Fiscal Note March 26, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023