House | 05/23/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 5142 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1927 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1219 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1219 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1219 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1219 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1214 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1214 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2463 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 502 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |