Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1923 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 7, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 22, 2023
Analysis May 22, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Witness List

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 10, 2023