E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2764
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5176
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5182
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2039
|
Journal Page: 5182
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5182
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5182
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5167
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5167
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4998
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 4529
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4529
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4562
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1999
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1999
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1999
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1999
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1999
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1999
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1999
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1656
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4529
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 503
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|