Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1930 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 17, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 8, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 13, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2023
Fiscal Note April 18, 2023