House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2341 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1401 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hall | Journal Page: 1387 |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1399 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2463 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 522 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |