Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1970 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 7, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note April 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023