Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2011 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 21, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Analysis May 19, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 30, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis July 5, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis July 5, 2023
Analysis May 6, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note March 30, 2023
Fiscal Note March 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023