Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2011 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2011


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Public Utility Commission of Texas
 to impose administrative penalties and enter into voluntary
 mitigation plans; increasing an administrative penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 15.023(b-1) and (f), Utilities Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the penalty for a
 violation of a voluntary mitigation plan entered into under
 Subsection (f) or of a provision of Section 35.0021 or 38.075 may be
 in an amount not to exceed $1,000,000 for a violation.  Each day a
 violation continues or occurs is a separate violation for purposes
 of imposing a penalty.
 (f)  The commission and a person may develop and enter into a
 voluntary mitigation plan relating to a violation of Section 39.157
 or rules adopted by the commission under that section. The
 commission may approve the plan only if the commission determines
 that the plan is in the public interest.  The voluntary mitigation
 plan must be reviewed at least once every two years and not later
 than the 90th day after the implementation date of a wholesale
 market design change.  As part of the review, the commission must
 determine whether the voluntary mitigation plan remains in the
 public interest. If the commission determines that the voluntary
 mitigation plan is no longer in the public interest, the commission
 and the person must agree to a modification of the plan or the
 commission must terminate the plan.  Adherence [If the commission
 and a person enter into a voluntary mitigation plan, adherence] to
 the plan must be considered in determining whether a violation
 occurred and, if so, the penalty to be assessed [constitutes an
 absolute defense against an alleged violation with respect to
 activities covered by the plan].
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a violation committed on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 violation committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect when the violation was committed, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2011 passed the Senate on
 April 4, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2011 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 73,
 Nays 67, three present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor