Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2013 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 21, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 30, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 20, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 20, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023