Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2013 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2013


 AN ACT
 relating to access to and the security of certain critical
 infrastructure.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 113.001, Business & Commerce Code, as
 added by Chapter 975 (S.B. 2116), Acts of the 87th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2021, is amended by adding Subdivision (5) to read
 as follows:
 (5)  "Affiliate," with respect to a company entering
 into an agreement in which the critical infrastructure is electric
 grid equipment, has the meaning assigned by the protocols of the
 independent organization certified under Section 39.151, Utilities
 Code, for the ERCOT power region.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter F, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.1183 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.1183.  ACCESS TO CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD
 INFORMATION:  INDEPENDENT ORGANIZATION CERTIFIED UNDER UTILITIES
 CODE. (a) An independent organization certified under Section
 39.151, Utilities Code, for security reasons is entitled to obtain
 from the department criminal history record information maintained
 by the department that relates to a person who has or is seeking
 employment at or access to the independent organization's systems
 that affect the security of the electric grid or any other
 background information maintained by the department that relates to
 the person that is considered necessary by the independent
 organization or required by the Public Utility Commission.
 (b)  Information obtained from the department under this
 section may not be released or disclosed except:
 (1)  as needed in protecting the security of the
 electric grid;
 (2)  as authorized by a court order or a federal or
 state law or order; or
 (3)  with the consent of the person who is the subject
 of the criminal history record information.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2274.0101, Government Code, as added by
 Chapter 975 (S.B. 2116), Acts of the 87th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2021, is amended by amending Subdivision (5) and adding
 Subdivision (6) to read as follows:
 (5)  "Governmental entity" means a state agency, a [or]
 political subdivision, or an independent organization certified
 under Section 39.151, Utilities Code, to perform a function
 described by Section 39.151(a), Utilities Code [of this state].
 (6)  "Affiliate," with respect to a company entering
 into an agreement in which the critical infrastructure is electric
 grid equipment, has the meaning assigned by the protocols of the
 independent organization certified under Section 39.151, Utilities
 Code, for the ERCOT power region.
 SECTION 4.  Section 39.151, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g-7) to read as follows:
 (g-7)  To maintain certification as an independent
 organization under this section, the organization must:
 (1)  identify all employee positions in the
 organization that are critical to the security of the electric
 grid; and
 (2)  before hiring a person for a position described by
 Subdivision (1), obtain from the Department of Public Safety or a
 private vendor criminal history record information relating to the
 prospective employee and any other background information
 considered necessary by the independent organization or required by
 the commission.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter H, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.360 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.360.  TRANSACTIONS WITH CERTAIN FOREIGN-OWNED
 COMPANIES IN CONNECTION WITH CRITICAL INFRASTRUCTURE.  (a)  In this
 section, "company" and "critical infrastructure" have the meanings
 assigned by Section 113.001, Business & Commerce Code, as added by
 Chapter 975 (S.B. 2116), Acts of the 87th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2021.
 (b)  An independent organization certified under Section
 39.151 may not register a business entity or maintain the
 registration of a business entity to operate in the power region for
 which the independent organization is certified unless the business
 entity attests that the entity complies with Chapter 113, Business &
 Commerce Code, as added by Chapter 975 (S.B. 2116), Acts of the
 87th Legislature, Regular Session, 2021.
 (c)  An independent organization certified under Section
 39.151 shall require as a condition of operating in the power region
 for which the independent organization is certified that a business
 entity report to the independent organization the purchase of any
 critical electric grid equipment or service from a company
 described by Section 113.002(a)(2), Business & Commerce Code, as
 added by Chapter 975 (S.B. 2116), Acts of the 87th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2021.
 (d)  For each purchase reported by a business entity under
 Subsection (c), the business entity shall submit an attestation to
 the independent organization that the purchase will not result in
 access to or control of its critical electric grid equipment by a
 company described by Section 113.002(a)(2), Business & Commerce
 Code, as added by Chapter 975 (S.B. 2116), Acts of the 87th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2021, excluding access specifically
 allowed by the business entity for product warranty and support
 purposes.
 (e)  Notwithstanding any other law, an independent
 organization certified under Section 39.151 may immediately
 suspend or terminate a company's registration or access to any of
 the independent organization's systems if the independent
 organization has a reasonable suspicion that the company meets any
 of the criteria described by Section 2274.0102(a)(2), Government
 Code, as added by Chapter 975 (S.B. 2116), Acts of the 87th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2021.
 (f)  A contractual provision that limits or contradicts
 Subsection (e) is contrary to public policy and is unenforceable
 and void.
 (g)  An independent organization certified under Section
 39.151 may adopt guidelines or procedures relating to the
 requirements in this section, including the qualification of
 electric grid equipment or services as critical.
 (h)  The commission shall adopt any rules necessary to
 administer this section or authorize an independent organization to
 carry out a duty imposed by this section.
 (i)  The attorney general may conduct periodic audits of the
 attestations required by Subsection (d) and may prioritize the
 audits as necessary to protect critical infrastructure.
 SECTION 6.  The changes made by this Act to Chapter 113,
 Business & Commerce Code, and Chapter 2274, Government Code, apply
 only to a contract or agreement entered into on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 7.  (a)  For the purposes of Section 39.360(c),
 Utilities Code, as added by this Act, a business entity operating in
 a power region on the effective date of this Act shall report to the
 independent organization certified for that power region under
 Section 39.151, Utilities Code, any purchase made within the five
 years preceding the effective date of this Act.
 (b)  For any past purchase reported by a business entity as
 described by Subsection (a) of this section, the business entity
 shall take reasonable and necessary actions to mitigate access to
 or control of its critical electric grid equipment by a company
 described by Section 113.002(a)(2), Business & Commerce Code, as
 added by Chapter 975 (S.B. 2116), Acts of the 87th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2021, excluding access specifically allowed by the
 business entity for product warranty and support purposes, and
 report those actions to the independent organization.
 SECTION 8.  It is the intent of the 88th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2023, that the amendments made by this Act be harmonized
 with another Act of the 88th Legislature, Regular Session, 2023,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2013 passed the Senate on
 April 4, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2013 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 1, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor