House | 05/18/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1788 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1788 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1636 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1015 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1015 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1015 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1015 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 991 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 991 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 990 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 852 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1788 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 526 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |