Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2018 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 1, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 6, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note April 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 1, 2023