E | 05/29/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/29/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3308 | |
E | 05/17/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2066 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4550 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2010 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1988 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1952 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4336 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Record vote | RV#1727 | Journal Page: 4335 |
House | 05/16/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4335 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4335 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4258 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Record vote | RV#1695 | Journal Page: 4257 |
House | 05/15/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4257 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4257 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3714 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2188 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2188 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2047 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Creighton | Journal Page: 1227 |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |