Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2032 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 13, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 9, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 12, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 12, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 15, 2023