E
|
06/13/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5890
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5196
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2048
|
Journal Page: 5196
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5196
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5196
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5121
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5121
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4835
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3501
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2334
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2048
|
Journal Page: 5196
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5196
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5196
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5121
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1360
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1347
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1346
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1346
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1346
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Bettencourt
|
Journal Page: 1346
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1345
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1083
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 527
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|